Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Hill Jason, Hills Jason, Hills Jason Aka Jason Carlos Hills, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Glendale with Curtis A. Kin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCurtis A. Kin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 13, 2020 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMay 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Filing Court HouseGlendale |
Petition for Change of Name
Date: November 13, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 13, 2020Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: November 13, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 13, 2020Proof of Publication
Date: December 29, 2020Decree Changing Name
Date: January 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)
Date: January 21, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jason Hill (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by Jason Hills (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 21, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Jason Hills (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name Filed by Jason Hills (Petitioner) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Decree Changing Name Filed by Jason Hills (Petitioner)
Date: January 21, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Decree Changing Name; Signed and Filed by: Jason Hills (Petitioner)
Date: January 21, 2021Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) Filed by Jason Hills (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by: Jason Hill (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Name Change Criminal History Assessment; Filed by:
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Updated -- Petition for Change of Name: Filed By: Jason Hill (Petitioner); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name; Filed by: Jason Hill (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.