Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Patterson, Nicholas, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Patterson, Caitlin, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with McLean, Sandra presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcLean, Sandra Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Time To Trial111 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Petitioner Filed 12-11-2020 Temporary Order Granted ; All day trial Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing Petitioner's Request for Order for the Respondent's Medical Records be Released to the Petitioner: Filed 1/31/2022 Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner Filed 12-11-2020 Temporary Order Granted - Continued from 01/25/22 at Counsel's Request to Review Dr. Rhoeder's 730 Evaluation Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-Opposition to Request for Order | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Change of Address | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Other (Non DCSS) Request for Order for the Respondent's Medical Records be Released to the Petitioner Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Evaluation Report Dr. Roeder's Child Custody Evaluation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.