Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Edwards, Elizabeth, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Ponder, Barock, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Clare Keithley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClare Keithley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner Filed 12/11/2020; Temporary Orders Partially Granted Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Domestic Violence Temporary Orders Partially Granted Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Temporary Orders Partially Granted Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Req for Domestic Violence Rest Order- no Minor Children (NF) | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment
Judge: Keithley, Clare |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.