Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Powell, Angela Chene, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Powell, Ronald Eugene, Ii, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen E. Benson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing Expires 12/23/2023 Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner's Request for Restraining Order Filed 12/8/2020 Temporary Orders Granted Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Temporary Restraining Order | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Domestic Violence Temporary Orders Granted Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Req for Domestic Violence Rest Order- no Minor Children (NF) | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.