Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gantt, Ileana Maria, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Gantt, Erin Therese, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. McLean Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 30, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner filed 11/03/2020 temporary orders partially granted; continued for service Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner filed 11/03/2020 temporary orders partially granted; continued for service Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing DV116
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Continue Hearing for TRO | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing DV116
Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner Filed 11-3-2020 Temporary Orders Partially Granted, Continued by Petioner's Request from 11-18-2020 Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner's Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order filed 11/03/2020 Temporary Orders Granted in Part Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Request to Continue Court Hearing and Reissue TRO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.