Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lei, Fangfang, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Abbott, Troy Alexander, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen E. Benson Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 21, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Time To Trial106 days |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Respondent's Objections to the Temporary Restraining Order Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Fee Waiver - Denied No fees due at this time Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Production of Documents and Things Set One | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Other Special Interrogatories |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing DV116
Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Conference Respondent's Objection to the Temporary Restraining Order, Respondent to Retrieve IPhone from Petitioner Judge: Keithley, Clare |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.