Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tewsley, Sharon, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Tewsley, Roy, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. McLean Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 16, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions19 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Case Cycle Time19 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner filed 10/16/2020 Domestic Violence Restraining Order - Temporary Orders Granted Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Action
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Temporary Restraining Order; Served 10/21/2020 | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Domestic Violence
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Req for Domestic Violence Rest Order - Minor Children (NF) | |
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.