Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Buer, Hannah Maurine, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Hessing, Wendy M, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Silva, Jesus, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSilva, Jesus, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing Domestic Violence Judge: Silva, Jesus, Jr. |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Substituted Service |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of New Hearing and Order on Reissuance (DV) | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing Domestic Violence Judge: Silva, Jesus, Jr. |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of service |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of New Hearing and Order on Reissuance (DV) | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration REQUEST FOR ORDER RE DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing Domestic Violence Judge: Silva, Jesus, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.