Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mendez, Encarnacion, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Mendez, Gerardo, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph J. Solga presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph J. Solga Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order stip & order for dismissal with prejudice |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing Domestic Violence Restraining Order Judge: Solga, Joseph J. |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing Domestic Violence Restraining Order Judge: Solga, Joseph J. |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of New Hearing and Order on Reissuance (DV) | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing DV--TE: 90 min. Judge: Solga, Joseph J. |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing Domestic Violence Judge: Solga, Joseph J. |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of New Hearing and Order on Reissuance (DV) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.