Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Johnston, Dorothy, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Dodds, Angelique Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph J. Solga presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph J. Solga Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Order After Hrg | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing Elder Abuse Judge: Silva, Jesus, Jr. |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of New Hearing Date and Order on Reissuance (EA) | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing ELDER ABUSE Judge: Solga, Joseph J. |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TEA or TEF) | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.