Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Pitkow, James, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Schultz, Natalie, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph J. Solga presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph J. Solga Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 20, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Wood, Victoria |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family) | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Judicial Action Order |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration: Default | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Wood, Victoria |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Conference Report |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Proof of Electronic Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.