Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mendoza, Erika, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Pulido, Sergio, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Francisca P. Tisher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrancisca P. Tisher Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 14, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing Domestic Violence Judge: Silva, Jesus, Jr. |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Consolidated Non-Lead | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of New Hearing and Order on Reissuance (DV) | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing Domestic Violence Judge: Silva, Jesus, Jr. |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response or Reply RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S DECLARATION DATED 12/28/20 AND FILED ON 12/29/2020 |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.