Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jacinto, Emilio T., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Serrano, Rocelyn O., in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph J. Solga presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph J. Solga Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Solga, Joseph J. |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family) | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration: Default | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Request: Enter Default | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration: Income and Expense | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Court | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Solga, Joseph J. |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.