Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Kairys, Cynthia Maria, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Hersey, Charles David, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Raymond A. Guadagni presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaymond A. Guadagni Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 06, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time179 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Trial: Long Cause TE: 2 weeks Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Conference: Trial Management
Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Other Hearing check in Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Trial: Long Cause TE: 2 weeks Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Conference: Trial Management
Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of New Hearing and Order on Reissuance (DV) | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order stipulation and order to continue trial |
|
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Stipulation to Continue TMC and Trial and Reissuance of TRO-DV (proposed orders x 2) | |
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | MSC Outcome |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.