Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jose J. Ceballos, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Patrea Rose Bullock, against General Motors, Llc, represented by Stacey S Davis, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Christopher G. Rudy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher G. Rudy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
This complaint alleges a violation of statutory obligations by General Motors LLC. The plaintiff, Jose J. Ceballos, purchased a 2018 Chevrolet Suburban 150 from the defendant. The vehicle developed several defects, including transmission, windshield ...
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: December 17, 2020Request: Dismissal, Entire Action With Prejudice
Date: October 18, 2021Minute Order
Date: August 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Request: Dismissal, Entire Action With Prejudice | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 05, 2021 | Hearing | Hearing: Dismissal after settlement | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration RE OSC AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 27, 2021 | Hearing | Conference: Case Management | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice: Settlement Conditional All Parties (Conditional 7-30-21) |
|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) to complaint, Atty Davis |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.