Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Clifford Rex Horner filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Peter H. Kirwan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter H. Kirwan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
This complaint is filed to extend the court's jurisdiction to any judgment that might be entered on behalf of Dutchints Development, LLC's affirmative claims. These claims are subject to a binding arbitration set to commence in February 2021. The com...
Cross-Complaint
Date: October 01, 2020Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: October 02, 2020Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: October 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2021 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 20 |
|
November 12, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing: Writ
Judge: Department 19 |
|
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Dutchints Opposition to Progressive Application for Right to Attach Order |
|
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of Clifford Horner ISO Dutchints Opposition to Application for RTAO | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of Vahe Tashjian ISO Opposition to Application for RTAO | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Personal | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Order | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Application Notice of Application & Hearing for Writ of Attachment. 11/12/2020 @ 9AM, D19. Atty Rossi Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Electronic | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Undertaking 10,000. Bond #. 3480586. SureTec Insurance Company. In records department Bond folder |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.