Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gustavo Chacon Salguero, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Eric Sebastian Trabucco, against Daniel H. Smith, D.H. Smith Company, Inc., South Bay Stucco, Inc., Steven P. Smith, represented by Richard A. Leasia, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Brian C. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian C. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Unlimited (15) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Order: Deeming Case Complex
Date: September 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2021 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 1 |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order: Deeming Case Complex Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/BCW. |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Transfer | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Bulk Scanned Documents From May 12, 2020 to May 27, 2020. [Stipulation + Order to Transfer] |
|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Bulk Scanned Documents From December 27, 2019 to February 13, 2020. [POS-010 / Complex Designation] |
|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Bulk Scanned Documents From March 5, 2020 to March 5, 2020. [FAC] |
|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Lawsuit Notice | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Bulk Scanned Documents December 24, 2019 to December 24, 2019. [Complaint / Summons] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.