Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Linh Tran, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Nakajima Ysautomo, Tuan Tran, represented by Robert T. Tang, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Maureen A. Folan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaureen A. Folan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2020 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: October 08, 2020Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: September 02, 2020Hearing: Fee Waiver
Date: September 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2021 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 6 |
|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Application | |
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Order-Grant GRANTED by Clerk. |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) to Complaint. Atty Tang. |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 22, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing: Fee Waiver
Judge: Department 6 |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) | |
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) AMENDED |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order RE: FEE WAIVER. Sept 22 @11:01 AM. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.