Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Katherine Gilson, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by William Charles Dresser, against Avana Almaden, Greystar California Inc., Greystar Worldwide, Llc., Gs Almaden, Llc., represented by Christopher E. Brumfiel, Michelle A. Perez, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Drew C. Takaichi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDrew C. Takaichi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 09, 2020 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: September 02, 2021Request: Dismissal
Date: September 30, 2020Complaint: Amendment To (New Party)
Date: September 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2022 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Drew C. Takaichi |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 14, 2021 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Drew C. Takaichi |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement with Proof of Service |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 11, 2021 | Hearing |
OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve
Judge: Drew C. Takaichi |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement with Proof of Service |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response (No Fee) to Complaint. Atty Perez |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.