Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Country Insurance Company, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Marc A Schwarz, against Filipe Santos Guimaraes, Gustavo Nunes De Paula, Filipe Santos Guimarae, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Superior Court of Santa Clara - Civil.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 01, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 31, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of Santa Clara - Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2021 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management C/F 1-26-21 Judge: Peter Kirwan |
|
June 03, 2021 | Hearing |
Motion: Order Compelling that Request for Admissionzs be Deemed Admitted by Plt American Country Insurance Company (Marc A. Schwarz) Judge: Peter Kirwan |
|
April 01, 2021 | Hearing |
Motion: Order Compelling Answers to Plt's First Set of Form Interrogs and Request fo Sanctions by Plt American Country Insurance (Marc A. Schwarz) Judge: Peter Kirwan |
|
February 18, 2021 | Action |
Notice of Motion Motion for Order compelling that request for admissions be deemed admitted 6-3-21 9am dept.19 |
|
February 18, 2021 | Action | Declaration of Attorney | |
February 18, 2021 | Action | Memorandum: Points and Authorities | |
January 26, 2021 | Action | Minute Order | |
January 26, 2021 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Peter Kirwan |
|
January 11, 2021 | Action |
Motion: Order Motion for Order Compelling Answer 4-1-21 9am dept.19 |
|
January 11, 2021 | Action |
Declaration of Marc A. Schwarz in support of motion for order 4-1-21 9am dept.19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.