Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rosanna Chu-Lam, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jessie H. Serna, against Bing Yen, Satoko Yen, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Thang Nguyen Barrett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThang Nguyen Barrett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2020 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: April 09, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 05, 2020Conference: Case Management
Date: August 11, 2020Minute Order
Date: August 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter #4772426 - $435 first appearance fee due for each party responding to the complaint. Total should be $870. |
|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 11, 2020 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Thang Nguyen Barrett |
|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter #4745332 - $435 first appearance fee due for each party responding to the complaint. |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint |
|
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) | |
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons: Issued/Filed | |
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.