Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Johnson Controls Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Joseph G. Mcguinness, against Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, represented by Mark Aaron Palley, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Thang Nguyen Barrett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThang Nguyen Barrett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: June 05, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 15, 2020Conference: Case Management
Date: August 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2021 | Hearing | Conference: Further Case Management | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 04, 2020 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Thang Nguyen Barrett |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) $150 jury fee deposited for plaintiff by atty Flashman |
|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) to complaint: atty Palley |
|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter EN 4393190 - Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals has not paid first appearance fees. The document requires a $435 Filing Fee or waiver of fees granted by this court. Please note: The name on Answer does not match sued as name. |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Proof of Service |
|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.