Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Santa Barbara, filed a(n) Limited Other Petition (Not Spec) (43) - 10,000 - 25,000 case against Seaview Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeebe, Jed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2021 |
CategoryLimited Other Petition (Not Spec) (43) - 10,000 - 25,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order, Filed to Set Aside Summary Judgment, Vacate Bail Bond Forfeiture and Exonerate Bail Bond / e-mailed to emily.bolter@ddslegal.com 3/17 |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion: Set Aside Judgment Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion: Set Aside
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document, Filed Non-Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Summary Judgment, Vacate Bail Bond Forfeiture and Exonerate Bail Bond; Notice of Non-Appearance |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Document, Filed | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion, Filed and Motion To Set Aside Summary Judgment, Vacate Bail Bond Forfeiture and Exonerate Bail Bond; Memorandum of Points and Authorities |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion, Filed | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice, Filed of Unpaid Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.