Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Carrillo Gutierrez, Deivi, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Misc Petition - Name Change |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Name Change
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication, Filed | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Reject Letter | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause for Change of Name, Filed | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.