Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chavier, Teresa, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Pro Se, against Batchelor, Sarah Chezahrae, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeebe, Jed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims $1501 - $5000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Debtors Examination - Small Claims
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service, Filed | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Application & Order to Appear for Exam, Filed | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing Claim $3,543.44 plus Costs $100.00 Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Plaintiff's Claim | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Small Claims |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.