Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Copley, Lane, Shultz, Lois, filed a(n) (16) Unlimited Fraud case against Tevis, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
Category(16) Unlimited Fraud |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Case Management Statement
Date: June 22, 2021Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: February 19, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice is granted. The Court finds that the doctrines of res judicata and collateral estoppel apply to bar the Complaint and the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings i...
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Motion hearings - Predispo Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Lane Copley; continued from 9/8/21 Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
September 08, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice is granted. The Court finds that the doctrines of res judicata and collateral estoppel apply to bar the Complaint and the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings i...
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Declaration in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Alternatively Motion hearings - Predispo Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice is granted. The Court finds that the doctrines of res judicata and collateral estoppel apply to bar the Complaint and the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is granted. Based upon this ruling, Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant's Responses to Requests for Production of Documents Set One and Monetary Sanction is denied as moot. The Case Management Conference set for September 29, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. is vacated. The Court shall prepare a form of order and judgment of dismissal. |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Receipt for Exhibits | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion hearings - Predispo Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses; continued from 9/1/21 Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.