Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Scherquist, Talia Lovell, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen E. Benson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2020 |
Category(43) Change Of Name |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Background Check Requested from Law Enforcement
Date: December 04, 2020Petition Hearing
Date: January 20, 2021Notice of Reassignment
Date: January 07, 2021Petition for Decree of Change Of Name
Date: December 03, 2020OSC re Name Change
Date: December 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
There is no proof of publication. If the petitioner presents proof of publication, the Court will grant the petition and sign the Decree provided.
Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Decree of Change Of Name Petition Hearing Petition for Change of Name Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
All - Proof of Mailing Proof of Mailing |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling There is no proof of publication. If the petitioner presents proof of publication, the Court will grant the petition and sign the Decree provided. |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof or Affidavit of Publication | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Decree Changing Name Decree |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Reassignment of All Purpose Judge Notice of Reassignment Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Background Check Results Received | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Background Check - Requested For Name Change Petition Background Check Requested from Law Enforcement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.