Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Magneson Tractor Service, Inc, Phipps, Cari, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Power, Stacie Lynn, against Landamerica Gateway Title Company, A California Corporation, Vincent Phipps As Successor-In-Interest To Cari Phipps, Vincent Phipps As Trustee Of The Phipps Family Trust, U A Dated May 7, 2018, represented by Griffith, David Richard, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 30, 2020 |
Category(06) Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Management Statement
Date: January 22, 2021Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part
Date: December 21, 2020Memorandum of Costs-Summary
Date: December 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendants' Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendants' Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant's/Cross Complainant's Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant's/Cross Complainant's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Case Management Conference Further Status Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendants' Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.