Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mccollum, April filed a(n) General Labor - Labor and Employment case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen E. Benson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management22 days |
Filing DateOctober 27, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Appeal Labor Commission Award |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Labor |
|
Case Management Statement
Date: November 12, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: November 18, 2020Notice of Appeal - Labor Commission Award
Date: October 27, 2020Amended Notice of Appeal
Date: November 09, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice of Appeal Case Management Conference Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Communication | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Appeal | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal - Labor Commission Award | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.