Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Forester, David Brandon, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen E. Benson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 22, 2020 |
Category(43) Change Of Name |
Last RefreshedJanuary 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Notice of Reassignment
Date: January 07, 2021Background Check Requested from Law Enforcement
Date: October 26, 2020OSC re Name Change
Date: November 23, 2020Petition Hearing
Date: January 13, 2021Petition for Decree of Change Of Name
Date: October 22, 2020OSC re Name Change
Date: October 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof or Affidavit of Publication Petition Hearing Petition for Change of Change; continued for Receipt of Proof Publication Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
January 13, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
There is no proof of publication. If the petitioner presents proof of publication, the Court will grant the petition and sign the Decree provided.
Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name Petition Hearing Petition for Change of Name Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling There is no proof of publication. If the petitioner presents proof of publication, the Court will grant the petition and sign the Decree provided. |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof or Affidavit of Publication | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Reassignment of All Purpose Judge Notice of Reassignment Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change OSC re Name Change Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Background Check Results Received | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing Order to Show Cause for Change of Name |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.