Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cambra, Marcella Renee, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Billingsly, Desirae, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Virginia L. Gingery presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVirginia L. Gingery Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2020 |
Category(43) Civil Harassment - No Fee |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Temporary Order Granted Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing
Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Temporary Order Granted Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing
Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Fee Waiver - Granted | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Temporary Orders Granted Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.