Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Tuccy, John, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Power, Stacie Lynn, against Cantello, Anne, Cantello, Anthony, Falconieri, Michael J, Falconieri, Olga A., Lafond, Dorothy, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen E. Benson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2020 |
Category(26) Limited Other Real Property - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Notice of Reassignment
Date: January 29, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: February 03, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Further Status Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.