Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Langford, Harrison, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lamb, Bryan David, against Does 1-20, Mohsenin, Darius, represented by Andersen, Philip M, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Marigonda, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarigonda, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2020 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Marigonda, Paul |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non_Criminal Minute Order Mediation Hearing Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Brief Filed | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Mediation Brief Lodged | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non_Criminal Minute Order Further Case Management Conference Judge: Connolly, Rebecca |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Referred to Judicial Mediation (Other ADR) | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
40845Noticeof0037ef2 Notice |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
40832CaseMana008bb8b Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
4243079_59820210202P Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.