Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Reiser, Ashley Amber, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Monique S. Langhorne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMonique S. Langhorne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2020 |
CategoryChange Of Name/Gender |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time42 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Decree: Name Change | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) Name Change Judge: Langhorne, Monique |
|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit: Proof of Publication | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certification From NSO |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | OSC: Name Change | |
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition: Name Change |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.