Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Guardado, Shirley, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Shukla, Pragya Bobby, against Dck California Construction, Inc., Dck Staffing Services, Llc, Dck Worldwide, Llc, represented by Thompson, Charles Oliver, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Victoria D. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVictoria D. Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 17, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Unlimited (15) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Wood, Victoria |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) Answer to complaint |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request As to: DCK Staffing Services, LLC & DCK Worldwide, LLC |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Court | |
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued and Filed Summons |
|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint (Unlimited) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.