Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Mental Competency (Pc 1368 & Wic 709) case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Syda K. Cogliati presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSyda K. Cogliati Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2020 |
CategoryMental Competency (Pc 1368 & Wic 709) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 13, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Cogliati, Syda Kosofsky |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Hearing
Judge: Cogliati, Syda Kosofsky |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Form Filed | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Mental Health Assessment and Evaluation Report | |
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Cogliati, Syda Kosofsky |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Psychiatrist/Psychologist | |
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Cogliati, Syda Kosofsky |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.