Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against James, Larry Nathaniel, represented by Nushwat, Jamil, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedSeptember 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Fingerprint Form | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probation Sentencing
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Prohibited Person Relinquishment Form Findings | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | EC2212 Cancel Affidavit Registration: Felony Conv-Imprisoned | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Officer's Report | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | (Compliant) - Probation Officer's Firearms Relinquishment | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Transcript (Type: Entry of Plea) | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.