Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Aguayo, Anthony Joseph Daniel, represented by Jenkins, Shani Diane, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Randy L. Edwards presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandy L. Edwards Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Further Proceedings (Pre) Re: | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Edwards, Randy |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation
Judge: Edwards, Randy |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Barnes, Steven |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Edwards, Randy |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pandemic Readiness Conference
Judge: Barnes, Steven |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.