Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Campise, Justin David, represented by Navarrete, Carlos Javier, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Michael J. Reinhart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael J. Reinhart Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2022 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings After Issuance of :
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 Effective 01/01/2022 | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.