Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Merry Pippin Llc, Feitelberg Peter, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Nussbaum Lane, against G. Aves Dave, Box Garage Inc. Auto, represented by Lozano Horacio, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Maurice A. Leiter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaurice A. Leiter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management39 days |
Filing DateOctober 23, 2020 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Commercial (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Complaint
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: January 19, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause - Settlement))
Date: January 25, 2021Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Dave G. Aves))
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Auto Box Garage, Inc.))
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: January 19, 2021Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS))
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Case Management Conference; Order t...))
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause - Settlement) of 01/25/2021)
Date: January 25, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet (Supplemental Allegations)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.