Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
National Default Servicing Corporation, filed a(n) Other Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Zahradka Robert, against 1425 East 110Th Street Los Angeles Ca 90059 All Claimants To Surplus Funds After Trustees Sale Of Real Property Located At:, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Compton with Kristin S. Escalante presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKristin S. Escalante Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 19, 2020 |
CategoryOther Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseCompton |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: National Default Servicing Corporation (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other pursuant to Civil Code Section 2924j(d) to de...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL ((Greenday Finance I LLC)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other pursuant to Civil Code Section 2924j(d) to de...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other pursuant to Civil Code Section 2924j(d) to de...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by National Default Servicing Corporation (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other pursuant to Civil Code Section 2924j(d) to de...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Confirmation of Deposit of Surplus...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Certificate of Mailing) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Entry of Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order) Filed by National Default Servicing Corporation (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Entry of Order))
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other pursuant to Civil Code Section 2924j(d) to de...))
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Entry of Order)])
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Certificate of Mailing)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other pursuant to Civil Code Section 2924j(d) to de...))
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Order (Granting Petition to Deposit Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustees Sale)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL ((Greenday Finance I LLC))
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other pursuant to Civil Code Section 2924j(d) to de...))
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Confirmation of Deposit of Surplus...))
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.