Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Charlotte Properties Inc., Fitness International Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Charlotte Properties Inc. A California Corporation, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Eyerly Dawn B., Silverstein Steven D., against Charlotte Properties Inc. A California Corporation, Fitness International Llc Dba La Fitness, represented by Eyerly Dawn B., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Stephen P. Pfahler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen P. Pfahler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2020 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Commercial (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 21, 2020Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations-Unlawful Detainer
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Fitness International, LLC))
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS))
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon])
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Related Case))
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Notice of Related Case) of 11/25/2020)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Brief (Defendant Fitness International, LLC's Brief in Support of Notice of Related Cases)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Related Case))
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For An Order Specially Setti...))
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Defendant Fitness International, LLC's Amended Brief In Support of Notice of Related Cases
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Consolidated Cases pursuant to the Stipulation...))
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS; [PROPOSED] ORDER)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO VACATE THE TRIAL DATE, OR...))
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice))
Date: November 15, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Unlawful Detainer (UD)
Date: November 19, 2021Notice of Continuance
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.