Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pacific Hills Community Association A California Non-Profit Mutual Benefit Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rubinstein Eugene Michael, against Brubaker Brooke, Brubaker John, represented by Shahabi Kamran, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Melvin D. Sandvig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelvin D. Sandvig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Certificate of Mailing for (COURT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 170.6) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Answer Filed by John Brubaker (Defendant); Brooke Brubaker (Defendant)
Date: January 28, 2021Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 170.6)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 170.6) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 170.6) of 09/18/2020)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 170.6))
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Certificate (Of Compliance Pursuant To Civil Code 5950)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.