Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Incredible Labs Llc, The Little Cottage Caregivers Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kalajian John Martin, against The Little Cottage Caregivers Llc, represented by Tushinsky-Fox Jacques, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Melvin D. Sandvig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelvin D. Sandvig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2020 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: Incredible Labs, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Incredible Labs, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Declaration of custodian of records; Filed by: Incredible Labs, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Undertaking; Filed by:
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: The Little Cottage Caregivers, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint; Filed by: The Little Cottage Caregivers, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Declaration re order to show cause re dismissal; Filed by: Incredible Labs, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00NOTICE & ORDER RE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FOR DEPT. F47 DURING COVID-19 PANDEMIC
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Notice (notice of continued case management conference)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Right to Attach Order After Hearing and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Memorandum (of points and authorities in support of application for issuance of order)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)))
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT))
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF ACTION REQUEST FOR DEFENSE
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Order to Deposit (Jury Fees)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Notice (of MSC, FSC and Trial)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Notice (of continued osc re dismissal/settlement)
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT))
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (of custodian of records)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE))
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition to Application for Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Writ of (of Attachment After Hearing)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Opposition to Right to Attach Order and Claim of Exemption
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Declaration (re order to show cause re dismissal)
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER))
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE))
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Declaration (of custodian of records)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Memorandum (of points and authorities in support of application for issuance of order)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)))
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice (of MSC, FSC and Trial)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Writ of (of Attachment After Hearing)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Notice (notice of continued case management conference)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE))
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition to Application for Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT))
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Order to Deposit (Jury Fees)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.