Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Darden Dennis Lee, Darden Dennis Lee Aka Dennis Lee Wafers, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Stephen P. Pfahler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen P. Pfahler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 01, 2020 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: October 01, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 01, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 01, 2020Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by:
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Dennis Lee Darden (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name; Filed by: Dennis Lee Darden (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Dennis Lee Darden (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Dennis Lee Darden (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Dennis Lee Darden (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Name Change Criminal History Assessment; Filed by: Dennis Lee Darden (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Dennis Lee Darden (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Fee Waiver Hearing)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by Dennis Lee Darden (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name Filed by Dennis Lee Darden (Petitioner) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Decree Changing Name; Signed and Filed by: Dennis Lee Darden (Petitioner)
Date: February 22, 2021Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)) Filed by Clerk
Date: February 22, 2021Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Fee Waiver Hearing)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Decree Changing Name Filed by Dennis Lee Darden (Petitioner)
Date: February 22, 2021Certificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) Filed by Dennis Lee Darden (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Proof of Publication; Filed by: Dennis Lee Darden (Petitioner); Service Costs Waived: No
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Fee Waiver Hearing))
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of 12/03/2020)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change))
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change))
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)])
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Fee Waiver Hearing))
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.