Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Huerta Viviana Regina, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Melvin D. Sandvig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelvin D. Sandvig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2020 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: June 29, 2020Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: June 29, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 29, 2020Petition for Change of Name
Date: June 29, 2020Decree Changing Name
Date: June 29, 2020Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: August 26, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 29, 2020Proof of Publication
Date: October 15, 2020Other - - AMENDED PETITION
Date: October 28, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Viviana Regina Huerta (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Amended Petition; Filed by: Viviana Regina Huerta (Petitioner)
Date: October 28, 2020Petition for Change of Name; Filed by: Viviana Regina Huerta (Petitioner); Joshua Huerta (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by:
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Viviana Regina Huerta (Petitioner); Joshua Huerta (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Viviana Regina Huerta (Petitioner); Joshua Huerta (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Decree Changing Name Filed by Viviana Regina Huerta (Petitioner); Joshua Huerta (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by Viviana Regina Huerta (Petitioner)
Date: October 15, 2020Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Amended Petition Filed by Viviana Regina Huerta (Petitioner)
Date: October 28, 2020Proof of Publication
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.