Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Erica Sandoval, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Janette Jackelyn Ortega-Muniga Padilla, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Maureen A. Folan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaureen A. Folan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Harassment |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Declaration: In Support
Date: March 22, 2021Minute Order
Date: October 13, 2020Stipulation
Date: October 13, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV
Judge: Department 4 |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration: In Support | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing (no fee) to Renew Restraining Order filed 10/13/2020 |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Request: Renew Restraining Order | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for crt Comm. Johnson to act as temp judge for all purposes |
|
October 13, 2020 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV
Judge: Department 4 |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order: Restraining Order After Hearing Granted 6 Months, Exp. 4-13-21 Judge: Maureen A. Folan |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Personal | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice: Hearing TRO Civil Harassment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.