Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rivera-Barbo, Evelyn Annette, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Arax, Brian M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArax, Brian M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 29, 2020 |
CategoryGuardianship - Person Only |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person (Initial) Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Confidential Court Investigation Report Fee waived |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Confidential Supplemental Court Investigation Report Report done by Irma Ramirez, DSS per 1513 (b) No fee entry |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Date: 3/23/2021 Time: 9:00a.m. Department: 303 |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Due Diligence as to: Paternal Grandparents of Ashtynn and Dylan Najera |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Consent, Nomination and Waiver of Notice Consent: /s/ Evelyn Rivera-Barbo Nomination: Waiver of notice of hearing: /s/ Rose Najera |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Date: 03/23/2021 Time: 9:00 a.m. Department: 303 |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Consent, Nomination and Waiver of Notice Consent: /s/ Evelyn Rivera-Barbo Nomination: Waiver of notice of hearing: /s/ Ignacio Garcia |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Consent, Nomination and Waiver of Notice Consent: /s/ Evelyn Rivera-Barbo Nomination: Waiver of notice of hearing: /s/ Samuel Amezqua |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Consent, Nomination and Waiver of Notice Consent: /s/ Evelyn Rivera-Barbo Nomination: Waiver of notice of hearing: /s/ Darren Garcia; /s/ Alexandria Garcia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.