Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Kuykendall, Sarah J., Kuykendall, Shaun D., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Arax, Brian M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArax, Brian M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 05, 2020 |
CategoryGuardianship - Person Only |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court Petition for Appointment of Guardian Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Date: 3/16/2021 Time: 9:00 a.m. Department: 303 |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return Letter Re: Petition for Visitation; Objection to Guardianship (submitted by Manuel E, Petatan) |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return Letter Re: Petition for Visitation; Objection to Guardianship (submitted by Kristin Taylor) |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Date: 3/16/2021 Time: 9:00 a.m. Department: 303 |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letters of Temporary Guardianship or Conservatorship cc emailed and mailed 2/8/2021 |
|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Date: 3/16/2021 Time: 9:00 a.m. Department: 303 cc in box 6 |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Temporary Guardian cc mailed - 1/20/2021 Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court Petition for Appointment of Guardian Judge: Arax, Brian M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.