Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Alexander, Allison Welke, Welke, Erik, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Arax, Brian M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArax, Brian M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2020 |
CategoryEstate |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the First or Final Account
Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition - Distribution Waiver of Account and Amended Report of Administrator with Will Annexed and Petition for Final Distribution Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition - Distribution Waiver of Account and Report of Administrator with Will Annexed and Petition for Final Distribution Judge: Mangano, Robert |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Final Distribution Waiver of Account and Amended Report of Administrator with Will Annexed and Petition for Final Distribution |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the Inventory and Appraisal
Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Waiver Verification of Waiver of Account and Report of Administrator with Will Annexed and Petition for Final Distribution by Erick Grinnell Welke |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver of Accounting by Erik Welke | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver of Accounting by Allison Welke Alexander |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.